|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2761.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1135.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 583.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on E., R. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|