06/25/2009 | In Senate. Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1467.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1468.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2253.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 2253.) To Senate. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 513.) To Assembly. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |