|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1842.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2315.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 9.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 625.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 586.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 421.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|