|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2273.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2301.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2855.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2711.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 685.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|