|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 614, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2267.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2937.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 923.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 702.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 586.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|