|
02/01/2010
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 680.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 637.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|