07/08/2009 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/26/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly. | |||
05/21/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/06/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 730.) | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |