California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB761 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/22/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 761AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Aanestad FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to  amend and repeal Section 128160 of   add Section 128196 to  the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care workforce. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 761, as amended, Aanestad. Health manpower pilot projects. Existing law allows the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development to approve experimental health workforce pilot projects in specified fields. Under existing law, pilot projects in rural and central city areas are given priority. This bill would  permit these pilot projects to be approved only if they focus on the health care needs of geriatric and disabled patients and patients with mental health treatment needs. It would delete certain fields from the list of those authorized for approved pilot projects   require the office, not later than June 30, 2010, and annually thereafter, to submit a report to the Legislature that includes specified information relating to approved or renewed health workforce pilot projects  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 128196 is added to the   Health and Safety Code   , to read:   128196. Not later than June 30, 2010, and annually thereafter, the office shall submit to the Legislature a report relating to all health workforce pilot projects approved or renewed pursuant to this article that includes, but is not limited to, assessment of outcomes, budget impact, and sources of funding.   SECTION 1.   Section 128160 of the Health and Safety Code, as amended by Section 52 of Chapter 31 of the Statutes of 2008, is amended to read: 128160. (a) A pilot project, if it addresses the health care needs of geriatric and disabled patients and patients with mental health treatment needs, may be approved in the following fields: (1) Medical auxiliaries. (2) Nursing. (3) Pharmacy personnel. (4) Mental health professionals. (5) Other health care personnel, including, but not limited to, chiropractic personnel, podiatric personnel, geriatric care personnel, therapy personnel, and health care technicians. (b) Projects that operate in rural and central city areas shall be given priority.   SEC. 2.   Section 128160 of the Health and Safety Code, as added by Section 9 of Chapter 415 of the Statutes of 1995, is repealed.