07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/25/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 6. Page 2260.) To Senate. | |||
06/17/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on B. & P. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 887.) To Assembly. | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 676.) | |||
04/13/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |