02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/22/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/07/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 15. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |