02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/18/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/15/2009 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
04/02/2009 | Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B., F. & I. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |