|
04/21/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Senate. Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3116.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 4545.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on April 7.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file. Unanimous consent granted to consider without reference to file. Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 4355.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 514.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|