|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2733.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 2673.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|