02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/28/2009 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/26/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/19/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/18/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 876.) | |||
05/05/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
04/30/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |