|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1924.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2617.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1097.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 1027.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 709.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|