08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 2479.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
05/28/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1038.) To Assembly. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 875.) | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
05/07/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |