|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2375.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 3062.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1169.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 676.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|