|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 2758.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 6.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
To Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 621.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 555.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 421.)
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|