|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2272.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2890.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2862.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 1038.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 680.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|