|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2388.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 3204.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3044.) To third reading. (Corrected September 16.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected July 2.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1138.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 684.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected May 5.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|