California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB804 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 804CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 66 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leno FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 798.71 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 804, Leno. Mobilehomes: sales and replacements. Under the existing Mobilehome Residency Law, the management may not show or list for sale a manufactured home or mobilehome without first obtaining the owner's written authorization, however management may require a homeowner to advise management in writing that his or her manufactured home or mobilehome is for sale. Existing law also provides that the management may not require the selling homeowner to authorize the management or any other specified broker, dealer, or person to act as the agent in the sale of a manufactured home or mobilehome as a condition of management's approval of the buyer or prospective homeowner for residency in the park. This bill would additionally prohibit the management from requiring a homeowner, who is replacing a mobilehome or manufactured home on a space in the park, in which he or she resides, to use a specific broker, dealer, or other person as an agent in the purchase or installation of the replacement home. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 798.71 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 798.71. (a) (1) The management may not show or list for sale a manufactured home or mobilehome without first obtaining the owner's written authorization. The authorization shall specify the terms and conditions regarding the showing or listing. (2) Management may require that a homeowner advise management in writing that his or her manufactured home or mobilehome is for sale. If management requires that a homeowner advise management in writing that his or her manufactured home or mobilehome is for sale, failure to comply with this requirement does not invalidate a transfer. (b) The management shall prohibit neither the listing nor the sale of a manufactured home or mobilehome within the park by the homeowner, an heir, joint tenant, or personal representative of the estate who gains ownership of a manufactured home or mobilehome in the mobilehome park through the death of the owner of the manufactured home or mobilehome who was a homeowner at the time of his or her death, or the agent of any such person other than the management. (c) The management shall not require the selling homeowner, or an heir, joint tenant, or personal representative of the estate who gains ownership of a manufactured home or mobilehome in the mobilehome park through the death of the owner of the manufactured home or mobilehome who was a homeowner at the time of his or her death, to authorize the management or any other specified broker, dealer, or person to act as the agent in the sale of a manufactured home or mobilehome as a condition of resale of the home in the park or of management's approval of the buyer or prospective homeowner for residency in the park. (d) The management shall not require a homeowner, who is replacing a mobilehome or manufactured home on a space in the park, in which he or she resides, to use a specific broker, dealer, or other person as an agent in the purchase of or installation of the replacement home. (e) Nothing in this section shall be construed as affecting the provisions of the Health and Safety Code governing the licensing of manufactured home or mobilehome salespersons or dealers.