02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 584.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |