|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4893.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6496.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2686.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2654.)
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 584.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|