|
06/03/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5291.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 19.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on April 27.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2731.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2664.)
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|