|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2729.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 557.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|