|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3075.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1107.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 499.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|