LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB812
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB812
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB812
Compare Versions
SB812 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB812 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB812 Amended August 20, 2010
SB812 Amended August 16, 2010
SB812 Amended June 28, 2010
SB812 Amended June 10, 2010
SB812 Amended January 13, 2010
SB812 Amended May 4, 2009
SB812 Amended April 14, 2009
SB812 Amended April 13, 2009
SB812 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB812 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB812 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB812 Amended August 20, 2010
SB812 Amended August 16, 2010
SB812 Amended June 28, 2010
SB812 Amended June 10, 2010
SB812 Amended January 13, 2010
SB812 Amended May 4, 2009
SB812 Amended April 14, 2009
SB812 Amended April 13, 2009
SB812 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare