|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2385.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3206.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3037.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 677.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|