LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB821
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB821
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB821
Compare Versions
SB821 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB821 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB821 Amended August 17, 2009
SB821 Amended July 6, 2009
SB821 Amended June 15, 2009
SB821 Amended May 20, 2009
SB821 Amended April 30, 2009
SB821 Amended April 16, 2009
SB821 Introduced March 10, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB821 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB821 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB821 Amended August 17, 2009
SB821 Amended July 6, 2009
SB821 Amended June 15, 2009
SB821 Amended May 20, 2009
SB821 Amended April 30, 2009
SB821 Amended April 16, 2009
SB821 Introduced March 10, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare