|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2328.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2886.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2826.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 829.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 639.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|