07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |||
06/22/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/22/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2198.) To Senate. | |||
06/17/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
05/21/2009 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/06/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/06/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 795.) To Assembly. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 639.) | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
03/11/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 10. | |||
03/10/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |