08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/16/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2544.) To Senate. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
07/09/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 928.) To Assembly. | |||
05/12/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 849.) | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
03/20/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 19. | |||
03/19/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |