|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2457.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on September 11.) Read second time. Amended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 3399.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3319.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Heard in committee on September 9.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3056.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3044.) Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 928.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 849.)
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|