BILL NUMBER: SB 829CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 624 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Governmental Organization (Senators Wright (Chair), Benoit, Calderon, Denham, Florez, Harman, Negrete McLeod, Oropeza, Padilla, Romero, Wiggins, Wyland, and Yee) MARCH 19, 2009 An act to add Section 19824.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 829, Committee on Governmental Organization. Gambling: licenses. The Gambling Control Act provides for the licensure of certain individuals and establishments involved in various gambling activities, and for the regulation of those activities, by the California Gambling Control Commission. The act provides for the appointment of an executive director by the commission. This bill would authorize the executive director and members of the commission to administer oaths and certify official acts in connection with the business of the commission. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19824.5 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 19824.5. The executive director and members of the commission may administer oaths and certify official acts in connection with the business of the commission.