|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2760.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 682.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|