|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6539.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3796.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3669.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3308.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|