05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/05/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
05/03/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2010 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3301.) From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3302.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2010 | Senate Rule 21.5 (k)(2) suspended. (Page 3220.) | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 22. (For reconsideration and vote only pending rules waiver.) | |||
04/13/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 3179.) | |||
03/12/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
01/21/2010 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
01/05/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 4. | |||
01/04/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |