|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3409.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3002.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|