04/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/28/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
04/19/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2:45 p.m. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4688.) To Senate. | |||
04/12/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 7.) | |||
03/18/2010 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/11/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/11/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2931.) To Assembly. | |||
03/03/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2901.) | |||
02/11/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
01/28/2010 | Set for hearing March 3. | |||
01/12/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |||
01/11/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |