|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6103.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 7.)
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2931.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2901.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Set for hearing March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|