LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB847
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB847
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB847
Compare Versions
SB847 Chaptered September 10, 2010
SB847 Enrolled September 1, 2010
SB847 Amended August 30, 2010
SB847 Amended August 26, 2010
SB847 Amended August 20, 2010
SB847 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB847 Chaptered September 10, 2010
SB847 Enrolled September 1, 2010
SB847 Amended August 30, 2010
SB847 Amended August 26, 2010
SB847 Amended August 20, 2010
SB847 Introduced January 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare