|
02/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2796.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2792.)
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Set for hearing February 10.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2757.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3891.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3551.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read second time. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3360.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 10.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 516.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|