10/20/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |||
10/19/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
10/13/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |||
10/08/2010 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5254.) To enrollment. | |||
10/07/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
10/07/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 7116.) To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 7161.) To Senate. | |||
06/10/2010 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3271.) To Assembly. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/15/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/21/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/12/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |||
01/11/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |