08/31/2010 | From Assembly without further action. | |||
08/31/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6899.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 50. Page 6911.) | |||
06/10/2010 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3273.) To Assembly. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/15/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/21/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/12/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |||
01/11/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |