|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 629, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4882.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 6. Page 6327.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (August 2 amended measure version corrected August 3.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 3705.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3497.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3307.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|