California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB88 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 29, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill June 7, 2010
Bill March 11, 2010
Bill September 4, 2009