|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4883.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6354.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6175.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3693.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (February 12 amended version corrected March 12.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|