|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4404.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2010
|
Set for hearing August 2.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4218.) Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Set for hearing June 23.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|