|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 3275.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|