04/22/2010 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3302.) Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3302.) Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/19/2010 | Senate Rule 21.5 (k)(2) suspended. (Page 3220.) | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 22. (For reconsideration and vote only pending rules waiver.) | |||
04/13/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3179.) | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |